Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/03/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/03/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/03/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/27/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/27/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/27/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/27/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/27/1998
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 03/27/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/27/1998
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 03/27/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/27/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/27/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/27/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 03/27/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/27/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/27/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/27/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/27/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/27/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/27/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/27/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/27/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/27/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/27/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/27/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/27/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/27/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/27/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 03/27/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/27/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/27/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/27/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/27/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/27/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/27/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 03/27/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/27/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/27/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/21/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/21/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 04/21/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/21/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/21/1998
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 04/21/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/21/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/21/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/21/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/21/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/21/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/21/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/21/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/21/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/21/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/21/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/21/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/28/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/28/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/28/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/28/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/28/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/28/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/28/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/28/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/28/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/28/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/28/1998
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/12/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/12/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/12/1998