Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 02/03/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 02/26/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 02/26/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/26/1998
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 02/26/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/03/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 03/03/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/11/1998
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/19/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/25/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/30/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/22/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/04/1998