Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/05/1998
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/05/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 02/05/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 02/05/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/24/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/24/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/24/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 02/24/1998
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 02/24/1998
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/24/1998
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/24/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/02/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/05/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 03/11/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/07/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/14/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/16/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/14/1998
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 07/15/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 07/22/1998