Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/24/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/24/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/24/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/24/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/24/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/03/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/11/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/16/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/24/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/25/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 03/25/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/27/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/30/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/31/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/31/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 04/01/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/01/1998
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/01/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/21/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/21/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/22/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/22/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/23/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/28/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/29/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/29/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/30/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/04/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/04/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/05/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/12/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/12/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/19/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/21/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/21/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/22/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/03/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/04/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/09/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/09/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/10/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/14/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/29/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 08/04/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/16/1998