Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 02/11/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/11/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 02/11/1998
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 02/11/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 02/11/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 03/11/1998
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/11/1998
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/11/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/11/1998
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 03/11/1998
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/11/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/11/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/11/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/11/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/11/1998
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 03/11/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/11/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/01/1998
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 04/01/1998
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/06/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/06/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/06/1998
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 05/06/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/04/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/04/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/04/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/04/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/04/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 06/18/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/18/1998