Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/12/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/25/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 02/25/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/04/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/11/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/17/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/17/1998
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/17/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/17/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/17/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/24/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 03/24/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/31/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/31/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/31/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/31/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/01/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/21/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/21/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/21/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/22/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/28/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/28/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/30/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/14/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/14/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/20/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/20/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 05/20/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/20/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/20/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/04/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/04/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/05/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/09/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/09/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/09/1998
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/17/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/17/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/15/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/15/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/15/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/15/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/15/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/15/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/17/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/17/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/21/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 08/06/1998