Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/12/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/12/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/09/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/09/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/09/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/09/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/09/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/09/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/09/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/09/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/09/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/09/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/09/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/09/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/09/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/09/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/09/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/09/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/09/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/09/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 03/09/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/09/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/09/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/09/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/09/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/09/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/09/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/07/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/07/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/11/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 06/11/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/11/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/11/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/11/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/11/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/11/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/11/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 07/29/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/09/1998