Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 02/12/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/26/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/26/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/26/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 02/26/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/26/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/26/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/05/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/05/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/05/1998
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/05/1998
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/05/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/05/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/10/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/10/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/10/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/10/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/10/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/10/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/10/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/10/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/10/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/10/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/10/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/10/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/10/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/10/1998
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/10/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/10/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/10/1998
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 03/10/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/10/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/11/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/11/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/11/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 03/11/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/11/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/11/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 03/11/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/11/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/11/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/11/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 03/11/1998
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/11/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/18/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/18/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/18/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/18/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/18/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/18/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/18/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/18/1998
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/18/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/18/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/18/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/18/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/18/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/18/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/18/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/18/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 03/18/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/18/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/18/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/18/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/18/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/24/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/24/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/24/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/24/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/24/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/24/1998