Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/26/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/26/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/26/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/26/1998
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 02/26/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 02/26/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/26/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/26/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/03/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/03/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/03/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/03/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/04/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/04/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/04/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/04/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/12/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/12/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/16/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/16/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/17/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/17/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/17/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/17/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 03/17/1998
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 03/17/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/17/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/23/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/23/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/23/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/23/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/23/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/23/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/30/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/30/1998
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/07/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/07/1998