Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/12/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/12/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/12/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/12/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 02/26/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/26/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/26/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/26/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 02/26/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/26/1998
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 02/26/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/26/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/26/1998
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 03/26/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/26/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/26/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/26/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/26/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/26/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/26/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/26/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/26/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/01/1998
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 04/01/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/01/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/01/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/01/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/01/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/23/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/23/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/23/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/23/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/23/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/23/1998
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 04/23/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/23/1998
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/21/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/21/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/21/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/21/1998
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/21/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/25/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/17/1998
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/17/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/17/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/17/1998
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/17/1998
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/17/1998
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 07/17/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/17/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/17/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/07/1998