Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 02/12/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/12/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 02/12/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 02/12/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/12/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/25/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/25/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/04/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/04/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/04/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/04/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/04/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/04/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/10/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/10/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/10/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/10/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/17/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/01/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/21/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/30/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/07/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/04/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/05/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 06/05/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/09/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/09/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/09/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/11/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/11/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/17/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/17/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/17/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/18/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/22/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/14/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/16/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/17/1998