Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 02/24/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 02/24/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 02/24/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/25/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/25/1998
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 02/26/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 02/26/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/03/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/03/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 03/03/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/03/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/03/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/10/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/10/1998
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/10/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/12/1998
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 03/12/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/12/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/19/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/19/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/19/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/19/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/25/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/25/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 03/25/1998
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 03/25/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/01/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 05/20/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/21/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/09/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 06/17/1998
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 06/17/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/19/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/23/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/23/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/23/1998
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 06/23/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/16/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/16/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/16/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/17/1998
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 07/20/1998
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/20/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/21/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 07/22/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 07/22/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 07/22/1998
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/23/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 07/24/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 07/24/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 07/29/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/29/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/30/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 08/05/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/09/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/09/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/09/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 09/09/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 09/09/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/11/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/11/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 09/11/1998