Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/03/1998
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/03/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/24/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/23/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/22/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/22/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/14/1998