Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/24/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/04/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/04/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/04/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/04/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/04/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/04/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/04/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/04/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/04/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/04/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/04/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 03/04/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/04/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/26/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/26/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/26/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/26/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/26/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/26/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/28/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/28/1998
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/28/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/28/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/28/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/28/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/28/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/28/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/28/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/21/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/21/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/21/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 05/21/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/21/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/21/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/22/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/22/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/18/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/18/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/18/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/18/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/18/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/25/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/25/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 06/25/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/20/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/20/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/20/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/20/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/30/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/30/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/07/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/01/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 10/01/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/13/1998