Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/04/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/04/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/04/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/05/1998
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 03/05/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/17/1998
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/17/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/17/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/24/1998