Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 02/25/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/04/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/04/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/04/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/04/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/04/1998
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/04/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/04/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/04/1998
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/04/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/04/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/05/1998
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 03/05/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/05/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/11/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 03/11/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/17/1998
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/17/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/17/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/24/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/24/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/24/1998
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/24/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/24/1998
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 04/22/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/22/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 04/22/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/22/1998