Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/25/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/25/1998
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/25/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/25/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 02/26/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/26/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/03/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 03/03/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/03/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/03/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 03/10/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/10/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/11/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/28/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/04/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/24/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/14/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/15/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/20/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/29/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/29/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/31/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew