Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 02/26/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 02/26/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/26/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 02/26/1998
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/26/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/03/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/03/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/03/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/03/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/03/1998
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/03/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/03/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/03/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/05/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/05/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/05/1998
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 03/05/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/05/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/05/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/05/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/05/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 03/05/1998
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 03/05/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/05/1998
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/05/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/05/1998
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/05/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/05/1998
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/05/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/05/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/05/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/10/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/10/1998
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/10/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/10/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 03/10/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/10/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 03/10/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/10/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/10/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/10/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/10/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/10/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/10/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/10/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/10/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 03/10/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/10/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/10/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/10/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/12/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/12/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/12/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/12/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 03/12/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/12/1998
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/12/1998
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/12/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/12/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/19/1998
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/19/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/19/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/19/1998
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/19/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/19/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/26/1998