Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/11/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 03/11/1998
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 03/11/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/11/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/11/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/11/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/11/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/11/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/11/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/11/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/26/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/26/1998
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/26/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/26/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/26/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/26/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/01/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 06/05/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/09/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/17/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/17/1998
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 06/17/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/17/1998
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/17/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/17/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/25/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/25/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/25/1998
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/25/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 06/25/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/25/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/25/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/25/1998