Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/10/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/10/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/10/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/10/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/10/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/10/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/10/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/10/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/10/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/10/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/10/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/10/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/10/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/11/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/17/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/23/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 03/23/1998
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 03/24/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/24/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/25/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/25/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/25/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/25/1998
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 03/25/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/25/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/25/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/25/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/27/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/27/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/31/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/01/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/01/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 04/21/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/21/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/21/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/27/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/27/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/30/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/07/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/12/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/21/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/22/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/03/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/15/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/15/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/21/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/09/1998