Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 03/03/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/03/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/19/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/19/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/19/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 03/19/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/19/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/19/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/31/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/31/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/31/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 03/31/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/21/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/21/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/30/1998
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 04/30/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/30/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/30/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/30/1998
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/30/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/07/1998
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/07/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/07/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/14/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/14/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/14/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/22/1998
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/22/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 05/22/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/22/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/22/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/22/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/22/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/22/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/05/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/05/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 06/05/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/05/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 06/05/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/05/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/05/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/10/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/19/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/19/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/19/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/19/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/19/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/19/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/19/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/25/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/25/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/25/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/25/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/17/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/17/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/17/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/24/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/24/1998