Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 02/26/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/26/1998
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/10/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/10/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/10/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/10/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/10/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/10/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/10/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/10/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/11/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/11/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/11/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/11/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/11/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/11/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/11/1998
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 03/11/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/11/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/17/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/17/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/17/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/17/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/17/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/18/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/18/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/18/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/18/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/24/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/24/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/24/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/24/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/24/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/24/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/24/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 03/24/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/24/1998
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/24/1998
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/24/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/24/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/24/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/23/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/23/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/23/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 04/23/1998
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 04/23/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/23/1998