Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/24/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/24/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/24/1998
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/24/1998
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/24/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/24/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/24/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/24/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/24/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 03/24/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/24/1998
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/24/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/24/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/24/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/31/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/31/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 03/31/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 03/31/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/31/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/31/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/01/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/01/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 04/01/1998
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/01/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/01/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/01/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/21/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/21/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/21/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/21/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/21/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 04/21/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/30/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/30/1998
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/30/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/30/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/25/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/25/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/16/1998