Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/04/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/04/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/04/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/04/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/04/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/26/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/26/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/26/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/26/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/26/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/26/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/26/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/26/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/26/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/26/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/26/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/26/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/29/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/29/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/29/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/29/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/29/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/29/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/29/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/29/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/29/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/29/1998
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/29/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/29/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/29/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/20/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/20/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/20/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/20/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/20/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/20/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/20/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/20/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/20/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/20/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/20/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/20/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/09/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/09/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/09/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/09/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/09/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/09/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/09/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/09/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/23/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/23/1998
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/23/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/23/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 07/24/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/24/1998
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/24/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/24/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/29/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 07/30/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/09/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/09/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/09/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/09/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/15/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/15/1998
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/15/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/18/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/05/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/15/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/15/1998