Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/05/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 03/05/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/12/1998
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/12/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/12/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/12/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/12/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/12/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 03/12/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/12/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/12/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/12/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/12/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/26/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/26/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/26/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/26/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/26/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/23/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/23/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/06/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/19/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/19/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/18/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/18/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/19/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/25/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/15/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/15/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/23/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/25/1998