Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 01/07/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 01/21/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/21/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/21/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/21/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/21/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 01/21/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 01/21/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/21/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/21/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/04/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/04/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 02/04/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/04/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 02/04/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/13/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/05/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/05/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/11/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/18/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/05/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 09/17/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/05/1998