Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/05/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/12/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/12/1998
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/12/1998
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 03/12/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/12/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/12/1998
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/12/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/12/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/12/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/12/1998
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 03/12/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 03/12/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/12/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 03/24/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/24/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/24/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/24/1998
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/24/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 03/24/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/24/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/24/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/24/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/24/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/24/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/26/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/26/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/26/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/27/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/27/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/27/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/31/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 03/31/1998
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/31/1998
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/31/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/31/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/31/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/31/1998
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/31/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/31/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/31/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/31/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/31/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/31/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/01/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 04/01/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/01/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/01/1998
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/21/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/21/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 04/21/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/21/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/21/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/21/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/21/1998
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/21/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/21/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/21/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/21/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/21/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/21/1998
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/21/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/21/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/23/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/23/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/23/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/28/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/28/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/28/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/28/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/30/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 04/30/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 04/30/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/30/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/30/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/30/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/30/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/30/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/30/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/30/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/06/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/06/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/06/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/06/1998
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/06/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/06/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/06/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 05/06/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/06/1998
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 05/06/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/06/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/06/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/06/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/06/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/13/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/13/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/13/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/13/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/13/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 05/13/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 05/13/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/13/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 05/13/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/13/1998
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/14/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/14/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/14/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/14/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/18/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/18/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/20/1998
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/20/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/20/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 05/20/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/20/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/20/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/21/1998
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/21/1998
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/22/1998
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 05/22/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 06/04/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/04/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/04/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/04/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 06/09/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/09/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/09/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 06/10/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/10/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/10/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/10/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/11/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/11/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/11/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 06/11/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/11/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 06/17/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/17/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/17/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/17/1998
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 06/17/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/17/1998
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/17/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/17/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/17/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/22/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/22/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/22/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/22/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/16/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/16/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/16/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/16/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/16/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 07/16/1998
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/16/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/16/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/16/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/16/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/16/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/16/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/16/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 07/16/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 07/16/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/22/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/22/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/22/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/22/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/22/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 08/04/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 08/04/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 08/04/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 08/04/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 08/04/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 08/04/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 08/06/1998
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 08/06/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 08/06/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew