Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/04/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 02/04/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/04/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/12/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/12/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/27/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/27/1997
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 02/27/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/05/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 11/09/1997