There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Affordable Housing Barrier Removal Act of 1998

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To remove barriers to the provision of affordable housing for all Americans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/11/1998Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/17/1998Referred to the Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Banking and Financial Services
03/11/1998Referred to the House Committee on Banking and Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/11/1998Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 03/11/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/11/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/11/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 03/11/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/11/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 03/11/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/17/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/17/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/17/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/01/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/01/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/01/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/22/1998
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 04/22/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/22/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/22/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/30/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/30/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/30/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/12/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 05/12/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 05/12/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/12/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/12/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/13/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/14/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/14/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/14/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/14/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/14/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/14/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/14/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/14/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/14/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/21/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/21/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 05/21/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 05/21/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/21/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 05/21/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/22/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/22/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/10/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/10/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/10/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/10/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/17/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/17/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/17/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/17/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/25/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/25/1998
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 08/06/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/08/1998

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Banking and Financial Services03/11/1998 Referred to
House Banking and Financial Services Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity03/17/1998 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3435.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3435. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/11/1998)

Affordable Housing Barrier Removal Act of 1998 - Provides for a Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD)-sponsored biennial conference on (regulatory) barriers to affordable housing.

Requires proposed and final agency rules to analyze their impact upon affordable housing availability. Directs the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development to develop model housing impact analyses.

(Sec. 5) Amends the Housing and Community Development Act of 1992 to authorize direct appropriations for State and local grants for regulatory barrier removal.

(Sec. 6) Amends the Housing and Community Development Act of 1974 to make affordable housing barrier removal eligible for community development block grant assistance.

(Sec. 7) States that the regulatory barriers clearinghouse shall be established within the Office of Policy Development of HUD under the direction of the Assistant Secretary for Policy Development and Research.

(Sec. 8) Amends the National Housing Act to: (1) repeal the single family mortgage insurance owner-occupancy requirement; (2) repeal mortgage limits on dwellings begun prior to insurance approval; (3) revise the definition of "area"; and (4) revise downpayment provisions.

(Sec. 9) Amends the Federal Home Loan Bank Act to: (1) include 1- to 4-family residential construction loans within the percent of residential assets required of a qualifying Federal Home Loan Bank; and (2) eliminate the 30 percent cap on certain real estate-related capital that may be held as collateral by a member institution.