Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/12/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 03/12/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 04/22/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/10/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/17/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/24/1998