Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/21/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 01/21/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/21/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 01/21/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 01/21/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 01/21/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/21/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 01/21/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 01/21/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/21/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 01/21/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 01/21/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 01/21/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 01/21/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/21/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 01/21/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 01/21/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 01/21/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/21/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 01/21/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 01/21/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/21/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/12/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/12/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/12/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/12/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/12/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 02/12/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 02/12/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/12/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/12/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/12/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/12/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 02/12/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/12/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/12/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/12/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/12/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/12/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/12/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/12/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/12/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 02/12/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 02/12/1997
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/12/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/12/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/12/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/26/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/26/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 02/26/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/26/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 02/26/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 02/26/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/13/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/13/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/21/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 04/09/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 09/29/1997