Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/17/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/17/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/17/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/17/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/17/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/17/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/18/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/18/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/18/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/25/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/25/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/25/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/31/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/31/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/31/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/22/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/22/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/22/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/22/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/28/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/07/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/07/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/19/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/20/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/20/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/21/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 06/03/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/17/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/23/1998