There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Dungeness Crab Conservation and Management Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Dungeness Crab Conservation and Management Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Magnuson-Stevens Fishery Conservation and Management Act to authorize the States of Washington, Oregon, and California to regulate the Dungeness crab fishery in the exclusive economic zone.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
08/04/1998Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 105-674.
03/18/1998Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date
08/04/1998Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 381.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/04/1998Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 105-674.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/22/1998Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/22/1998Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Resources
06/04/1998Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans
06/04/1998Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans
05/07/1998Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans
03/23/1998Executive Comment Requested from Commerce.
Action By: Committee on Resources
03/23/1998Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Resources
03/18/1998Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/18/1998Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E410-411)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/18/1998Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (8)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources03/18/1998 Referred to
07/22/1998 Markup by
08/04/1998 Reported by H. Rept. 105-674
House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans03/23/1998 Referred to
05/07/1998 Hearings by
06/04/1998 Markup by
06/04/1998 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.3498.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3498. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (08/04/1998)

Dungeness Crab Conservation and Management Act - Authorizes each of the States of Washington, Oregon, and California to adopt and enforce laws and regulations governing fishing and processing in the exclusive economic zone (EEZ) adjacent to that State in any Dungeness crab fishery for which there is no management plan in effect under the Magnuson-Stevens Fishery Conservation and Management Act. Prohibits harvesting or processing Dungeness crab in the EEZ adjacent to those States except as authorized by a permit issued by any of those States or under certain tribal rights. Removes related interim authority provisions of the Sustainable Fisheries Act.