Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 03/19/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/19/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/27/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 03/27/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/27/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/22/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/22/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/22/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/30/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/30/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/30/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/22/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/22/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/17/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/17/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 07/14/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/23/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/23/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/23/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/10/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/10/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/10/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/10/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/10/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/10/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/16/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/16/1998
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 09/16/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/18/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/18/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/26/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/26/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/08/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/08/1998