Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/19/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/19/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/19/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/19/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/19/1998
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/24/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/24/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/24/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/27/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/27/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/01/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/21/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/21/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/21/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/28/1998
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/28/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/28/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 04/28/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/28/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/28/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/29/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/29/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/29/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/29/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/30/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/07/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/13/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/14/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/19/1998
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/20/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/03/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/03/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/04/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 06/09/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/10/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/10/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/16/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/18/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/22/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/24/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/25/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/25/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/14/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/14/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/14/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/14/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/14/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 07/14/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/14/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/22/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/22/1998
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 09/10/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/10/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/10/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/11/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/15/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/25/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/25/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/01/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/02/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/06/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/06/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/08/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/09/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/09/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/09/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 10/10/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 10/14/1998