Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/03/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/18/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/22/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/14/1998