Refine your search

Refined by:

Minnesota Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/28/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/29/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/10/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/15/1998