Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/19/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/20/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/10/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/24/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/25/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 07/14/1998