Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/24/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/21/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/06/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/09/1998