Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 04/28/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 06/09/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/10/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 07/14/1998