Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 03/19/1998
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/19/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/26/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/26/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/26/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/26/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/26/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 03/26/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/26/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 03/26/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/26/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/26/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 04/01/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/01/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 04/01/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/01/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/01/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/01/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/01/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 04/01/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/01/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/01/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/01/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/01/1998
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/01/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/01/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/01/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/21/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 04/21/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/21/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/21/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/21/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/21/1998
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/21/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/21/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/21/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/21/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/21/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/21/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/21/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/23/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/23/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 04/23/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 04/23/1998
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 04/23/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/23/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/23/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/23/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/23/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/23/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/23/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/23/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/23/1998
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/23/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/23/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 04/23/1998
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/23/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/23/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/28/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/28/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/28/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/28/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/28/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/28/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 04/29/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/29/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/29/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/29/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/30/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 04/30/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/30/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/30/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/30/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/30/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/05/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 05/05/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/05/1998
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/05/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 05/05/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/05/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/05/1998
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/06/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 05/06/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/06/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/06/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/06/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/06/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/06/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/06/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/12/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/12/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/12/1998
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 05/12/1998
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 05/12/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/12/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/12/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 05/12/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/12/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/12/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/12/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/21/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/21/1998
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/21/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/21/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/21/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/21/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/21/1998
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/21/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/21/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/21/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/21/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/21/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/22/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 05/22/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/10/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/10/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/10/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/10/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/10/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/10/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/10/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 06/10/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 06/10/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/10/1998
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 06/10/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/16/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/16/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/16/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/16/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/16/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/24/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 06/24/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/24/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/24/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/25/1998
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/14/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/14/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/17/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/17/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/21/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/21/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 08/06/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 08/06/1998
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/17/1998