Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 03/24/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 03/24/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/24/1998
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 03/24/1998
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/25/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/28/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/28/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/28/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/28/1998
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 04/28/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/28/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/28/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 04/28/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 04/28/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/28/1998
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/28/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/28/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 04/28/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/28/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/28/1998
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/28/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/28/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/28/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/28/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/28/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/28/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/28/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/28/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/28/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/28/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/28/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 04/28/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/28/1998
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/28/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/28/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 04/28/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/28/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/28/1998
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/28/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/28/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/28/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 04/28/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/28/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 04/29/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 04/29/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/29/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 04/29/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/29/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 04/29/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 04/29/1998
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/29/1998
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 04/30/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/30/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/06/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/06/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/06/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/06/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/06/1998
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/06/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/06/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/06/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/06/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/06/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/06/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/06/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/06/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/06/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/06/1998
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 05/06/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/06/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/06/1998