Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 04/01/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/01/1998
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/01/1998
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 04/01/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/01/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/01/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/01/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/01/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/01/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/01/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/01/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/01/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 04/01/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/01/1998
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/28/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/28/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/28/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/28/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/28/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 04/28/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/28/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/28/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/28/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/28/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/28/1998
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 04/28/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/28/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/28/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/28/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/07/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/07/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/07/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/07/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/07/1998
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 05/07/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/07/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/07/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/07/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 05/07/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/07/1998
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/07/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/07/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/07/1998
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/12/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/12/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/12/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/22/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/22/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/22/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 06/18/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/17/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/17/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 08/07/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 08/07/1998