Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/06/1998
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/13/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/14/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/19/1998
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/20/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/10/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 06/17/1998