Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/12/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/19/1998
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 06/04/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/10/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/25/1998