Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/05/1998
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 06/16/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 07/16/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/29/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/06/1998