Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/22/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/22/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/29/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/06/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/13/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/14/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/19/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 05/19/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/10/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 06/16/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/14/1998