Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/21/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/23/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/28/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/29/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/30/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/05/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/16/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/14/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/14/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 08/06/1998