Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/21/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/29/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/05/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/14/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/14/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 06/24/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/15/1998