Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/31/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/21/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/21/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 04/30/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/05/1998
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/14/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/21/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 06/05/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/10/1998
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 06/23/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/16/1998